+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-428) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-428).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-428).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 2, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On February 3, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 20, 2022 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 20, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 523 - 7 section 3910-B, sub-section 1
- Chapter 523 - 7 section 3910-B, sub-section 4
- Chapter 523 - 7 section 3910-B, sub-section 2
- Chapter 523 - 7 section 3910-B, sub-section 1-A
+ − Sponsors (2)
Catherine BREEN
Type:
Primary Sponsor