+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- ROLL CALL NO. 790V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- LD 1824 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 27 In the Affirmative and 8 In the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- 126 having voted in the affirmative and 21 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 128 - Nays 15 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 728
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-533) thereto
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, the Senate, Under suspension of the rules, RECONSIDERED whereby Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-511), in concurrence.
- TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot.
- On further motion by Same Senator The Senate Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-511).
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-533) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-533) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-533) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 700
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- (Yeas 131 - Nays 16 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- Subsequently, Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) ACCEPTED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 571
- 31 Yeas - 4 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-511)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-511).
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative DION of Portland REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 697
- (Yeas 130 - Nays 16 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reports READ.
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-511)
- Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass as Amended. AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-511)
- Unfinished Business
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (44)
- Chapter 598 - 4 section 1057, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 598 - 5 section 1591, sub-section 4, paragraph A
- Chapter 598 - 30-A section 701, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 598 - 30-A section 710, sub-section 1
- Chapter 598 - 30-A section 710, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 598 - 30-A section 710, sub-section 2
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1404, sub-section 1
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 1
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph E
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph F
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph G
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph H
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph I
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph J
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1801, sub-section 2, paragraph K
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1802, sub-section 1
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 1
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 2, paragraph E
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 5, paragraph D
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 5, paragraph E
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 5, paragraph F
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 5, paragraph G
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 7
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803, sub-section 8
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803-A, sub-section 3
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1803-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1805
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1806, sub-section 7
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1808
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1809
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1810
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1811
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1812
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1813
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1814
- Chapter 598 - 34-A section 1815
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2014: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 126
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 4
May 1, 2014: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
April 17, 2014: Enactment - Emer
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 8
April 14, 2014: Enactment - Emer
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 4
April 11, 2014: ACC REPORT 'A' OTP AS AMEND
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 5
April 11, 2014: ACCEPT RPT 'A' OTP-A
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor