+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-910), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-910) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-910).
On April 1, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 10, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On March 3, 2022 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On December 15, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 15, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 638 - 24-A section 4320-R
- Chapter 638 - 24-A section 4320-A, sub-section 3-B
- Chapter 638 - 24-A section 4320-A, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 638 - 24-A section 4320-A, sub-section 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor