+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subsequently, FINALLY PASSED , in concurrence.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 116 - Nays 25 - Absent 10 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 612
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-454) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-454).
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 577
- (Yeas 92 - Nays 44 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-454) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-454).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 1, 2014: Final Passage - Emer
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 10
March 26, 2014: ACC OUGHT TO PASS AS AMEND REP
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor