+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-163) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-163) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-163).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-163) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 86 - 17-A section 517
- Chapter 86 - 25 section 3801
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor