+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
- 16 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent FAILED
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- Senator HASKELL of Cumberland moved The Senate INSIST To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-830) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Senator COLLINS of York moved to The Senate RECEDE and CONCURE To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-830)
- AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "B" (H-847) thereto , in concurrence. FAILED
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 603
- Subsequently, INSISTED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-830) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-830).
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 742
- (Yeas 145 - Nays 1 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative WILLETTE of Mapleton, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-830).
- On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-830).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-830) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-847) thereto ADOPTED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "B" (H-847) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-830) was READ and ADOPTED.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
- Unfinished Business
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-830) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-847) thereto
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-830) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-830), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-830)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 586 - 23 section 1968, sub-section 2-C
- Chapter 586 - 23 section 1969, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 586 - 29-A section 523, sub-section 7
- Chapter 586 - 29-A section 523, sub-section 8
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2014: Enactment - Emer
- Yeas: 145
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
April 17, 2014: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 2