+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-817) thereto , in concurrence.
- On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-484)
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-484).
- On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-484).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-484) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-817) thereto ADOPTED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-817) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-484) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-484) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-817) thereto
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- HELD at the Request of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-484).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-484) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-484).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Reported by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin for the Joint Standing Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology pursuant to Resolve 2013, chapter 47, section 1.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor