+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-510) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-510), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-510).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2-B
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2, paragraph F
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2, paragraph H
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1354, sub-section 7
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2, paragraph G
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1354, sub-section 6, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 7
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 3, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 3, paragraph D
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2-B
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2, paragraph F
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 3
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2, paragraph H
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1354, sub-section 7
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2, paragraph G
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1354, sub-section 6, paragraph A
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 7
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 3, paragraph E
- Chapter 337 - 29-A section 1352, sub-section 3, paragraph D
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor