+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On January 24, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP
On January 13, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP
- Work Session Held
On November 30, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on November 30, 2021.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor