+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 134 - Nays 0 - Absent 16 - Excused 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 321
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-630) thereto in concurrence
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-630) thereto.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-630) thereto was ADOPTED.
- On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-630) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-299).
- On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-299).
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-299).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-299).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (82)
- Chapter null - 22 section 2158-A
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 27
- Chapter null - 7 section 2231
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-N
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 30
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 31
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1102, sub-section 4, paragraph G
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-O
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-M
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-I
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-H
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 3-C
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-L
- Chapter null - 22 section 2157, sub-section 14, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 32
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-G
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 35
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1101, sub-section 22-A
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 36
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-F
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-P
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 33
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 3-B
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-E
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1101, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 22 section 2157, sub-section 15
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1101, sub-section 22
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 19
- Chapter null - 22 section 2157, sub-section 11
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-S
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-K
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-J
- Chapter null - 22 section 2157, sub-section 13, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-B
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-Q
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 16
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 28
- Chapter null - 28-B section 102, sub-section 37
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-D
- Chapter null - 17-A section 1101, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-R
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2158-A
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 27
- Chapter 528 - 7 section 2231
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-N
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 30
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 31
- Chapter 528 - 17-A section 1102, sub-section 4, paragraph G
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-O
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-M
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-I
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-H
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 3-C
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-L
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2157, sub-section 14, paragraph C
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 32
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-G
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 35
- Chapter 528 - 17-A section 1101, sub-section 22-A
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 36
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-F
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-P
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 33
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 3-B
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-E
- Chapter 528 - 17-A section 1101, sub-section 5
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2157, sub-section 15
- Chapter 528 - 17-A section 1101, sub-section 22
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 19
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2157, sub-section 11
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-S
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-K
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-J
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2157, sub-section 13, paragraph C
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-B
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-Q
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 16
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 28
- Chapter 528 - 28-B section 102, sub-section 37
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-D
- Chapter 528 - 17-A section 1101, sub-section 1
- Chapter 528 - 22 section 2422, sub-section 4-R
+ − Vote
June 19, 2019: Enactment
- Yeas: 134
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor