+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-456).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-456) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-456), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES.
- Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter null - 12 section 6856, sub-section 2-A, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 12 section 6810-B, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 12 section 6625, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 12 section 6856, sub-section 1
- Chapter 334 - 12 section 6856, sub-section 2-A, paragraph D
- Chapter 334 - 12 section 6810-B, sub-section 4
- Chapter 334 - 12 section 6625, sub-section 1
- Chapter 334 - 12 section 6856, sub-section 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor