+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-448).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-448).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-448) READ and ADOPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter 527 - 32 section 5514, sub-section 3, paragraph C
- Chapter 527 - 32 section 5515, sub-section 3
- Chapter 527 - 32 section 5515, sub-section 4
- Chapter 527 - 32 section 5515, sub-section 5
- Chapter 527 - 32 section 5515, sub-section 5-A
- Chapter 527 - 32 section 5515, sub-section 6
- Chapter 527 - 32 section 5516, sub-section 1
- Chapter 527 - 32 section 5516, sub-section 2