+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report And PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-684) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate INSISTED
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 577 Yeas 17 - Nays 17 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook moved The Senate RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 578 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-683).
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 564 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Reports Read
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-684) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-684) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Sent down for concurrence
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-683) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-683).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On December 22, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (32)
- Chapter null - 21-A section 662, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 21-A section 354, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 21-A section 902, paragraph 2
- Chapter null - 21-A section 683
- Chapter null - 21-A section 903-D, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 21-A section 601, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 21-A section 23, sub-section 7
- Chapter null - 21-A section 163, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 21-A section 1204-B, sub-section 80, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 21-A section 23, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 21-A section 601, sub-section 2, paragraph H
- Chapter null - 21-A section 754-A, sub-section 1, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 30-A section 62, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 21-A section 672, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 21-A section 682
- Chapter null - 21-A section 905-A, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 21-A section 365, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 21-A section 103, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 21-A section 760-B, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 30-A section 5772, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter null - 21-A section 753-B, sub-section 8
- Chapter null - 21-A section 335, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 21-A section 753-B, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 30-A section 2528, sub-section 6-A, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 21-A section 903-E
- Chapter null - 21-A section 905-A
- Chapter null - 30-A section 2528, sub-section 6-A, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 21-A section 682, sub-section 2-B
- Chapter null - 28-A section 121, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 21-A section 903-D
- Chapter null - 21-A section 682, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 30-A section 2528, sub-section 4, paragraph D
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2018: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2018: INSIST
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
March 29, 2018: ACCEPT MIN OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17