+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (56)
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ROLL CALL NO. 427V
- 68 having voted in the affirmative and 65 in the negative, with 17 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the House RECEDED.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, House Amendment "B" (H-738) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) was READ and ADOPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 388
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 68 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-738) thereto was ADOPTED.
- Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-738) thereto.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved to RECEDE and CONCUR
- On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland The Senate RECONSIDERED the RECEDE and CONCUR motion
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-738) thereto in concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 464 Yeas 18 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 472 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
- Later today assigned.
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
- Taken from the table by the President
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 438 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- RELEASED.
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- HELD at the Request of Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 388 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) in concurrence
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 302
- (Yeas 76 - Nays 64 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-640) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-640).
- ROLL CALL NO. 303
- (Yeas 76 - Nays 62 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On June 1, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on May 13, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- Chapter null - 21-A section 1011, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 35-A section 1511-A
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-G, sub-section 36
- Chapter null - 21-A section 354, sub-section 5, paragraph H
- Chapter null - 21-A section 354, sub-section 5, paragraph G
- Chapter null - 21-A section 354, sub-section 5, paragraph I
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3502, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4010
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4009
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4008
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4007
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4006
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4005
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4004
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4003
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4002
- Chapter null - 35-A section 4001
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3501, sub-section 1, paragraph F
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3501, sub-section 1, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3501, sub-section 1, paragraph D
+ − Votes (8)
July 19, 2021: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 65
- Absent: 17
June 30, 2021: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2021: ADOPT HBH-738 to CAH-640
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 68
- Absent: 6
June 30, 2021: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16
June 17, 2021: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 18
June 16, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16
June 15, 2021: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 11
June 15, 2021: PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 62
- Absent: 13