+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-57).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-57).
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-57) READ and ADOPTED.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Tuttle of York REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 128 - 8 section 1036, sub-section 2-C, paragraph D
- Chapter 128 - 37-B section 512, sub-section 1
- Chapter 128 - 37-B section 514
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor