+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-396) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) in concurrence
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-396) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-396) thereto ADOPTED
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) was ADOPTED
- Sent down for concurrence
On July 2, 2021 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) as Amended by as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-396) thereto.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-707).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) Report ACCEPTED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 428 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-707) in concurrence
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 16, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/OTP-AM
On May 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative HARNETT for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 4, section 1804, subsection 3, paragraph H reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- Chapter 481 - 4 section 1805, sub-section 9-A
- Chapter 481 - 4 section 1804, sub-section 4, paragraph D
- Chapter 481 - 4 section 1804, sub-section 3, paragraph O
- Chapter 481 - 4 section 1804, sub-section 3, paragraph N
- Chapter 481 - 4 section 1804, sub-section 3, paragraph M
- Chapter 481 - 4 section 1804, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter 481 - 2 section 6, sub-section 12
+ − Vote
June 17, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor