+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 107 - Nays 29 - Absent 12 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 209
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-221).
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-221) READ and ADOPTED.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-221).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (28)
- Chapter null - 38 section 577-A
- Chapter null - 35-A section 10104, sub-section 4, paragraph F
- Chapter null - 38 section 574, sub-section 1-C
- Chapter null - 38 section 577
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 24-G
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3402, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3210, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter null - 38 section 578
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3210-C, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 38 section 576
- Chapter null - 38 section 574, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3210, sub-section 1-B
- Chapter null - 38 section 576-A
- Chapter null - 38 section 574, sub-section 1-B
- Chapter 476 - 38 section 577-A
- Chapter 476 - 35-A section 10104, sub-section 4, paragraph F
- Chapter 476 - 38 section 574, sub-section 1-C
- Chapter 476 - 38 section 577
- Chapter 476 - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 24-G
- Chapter 476 - 35-A section 3402, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 476 - 35-A section 3210, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 476 - 38 section 578
- Chapter 476 - 35-A section 3210-C, sub-section 3
- Chapter 476 - 38 section 576
- Chapter 476 - 38 section 574, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 476 - 35-A section 3210, sub-section 1-B
- Chapter 476 - 38 section 576-A
- Chapter 476 - 38 section 574, sub-section 1-B
+ − Vote
June 7, 2019: Enactment - Emer
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor