+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-615).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-615)
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 14, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 359 - 34-A section 3031, sub-section 2, paragraph A-1
- Chapter 359 - 34-A section 3031, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 359 - 34-A section 3014
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor