+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- LD 1663 In Senate, April 15, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 in the Affirmative and 15 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-754) thereto , in concurrence.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-441).
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441).
- ROLL CALL NO. 589
- On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-754) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) was READ and ADOPTED.
- (Yeas 82 - Nays 55 - Absent 14 - Excused 0)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-754) thereto ADOPTED.
- Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-754) thereto
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- (Yeas 86 - Nays 56 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 560
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-441)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 480 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- Subsequently, Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to accept the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report
- Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report
- Reports READ
On December 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 23, 2013 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 15, 2014: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
March 27, 2014: ADOPT HAH-754 TO CAS-441
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 14
March 25, 2014: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 9
March 24, 2014: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor