+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-347), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-347) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-347).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 221 - 38 section 1609-A, sub-section 3, paragraph D
- Chapter 221 - 38 section 1609-A, sub-section 3, paragraph C
- Chapter 221 - 38 section 1609-A, sub-section 3, paragraph B
- Chapter 221 - 38 section 1609-A, sub-section 3-A
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor