+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-416).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-416) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-416).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by HILL of York for the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs REFERRED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On December 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 23, 2013 and REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 497 - 20-A section 5806, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor