+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-405).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Senator BOYLE of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report Committee Amendment "A" (S-405). On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) Report.
- Reports READ
On December 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 23, 2013 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2