+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Unfinished Business
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor