+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
- ROLL CALL NO. 402V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 82 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained.
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) READ and ADOPTED
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 87 - Nays 54 - Absent 9 - Excused 1)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 287
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-461).
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-461) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 63
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
June 9, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 54
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor