+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-62), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-62) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-62).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter 89 - 27 section 372, sub-section 3
- Chapter 89 - 27 section 373-A, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter 89 - 27 section 373-A, sub-section 8
- Chapter 89 - 27 section 374
- Chapter 89 - 27 section 375, sub-section 1
- Chapter 89 - 27 section 376
- Chapter 89 - 27 section 377
- Chapter 89 - 27 section 378