+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Read Once
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.