+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Woodsome of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
- Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 398 - 35-A section 8704, sub-section 1, paragraph E