+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-599) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-599) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator EDGECOMB of Aroostook The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Reports READ
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- (Yeas 84 - Nays 64 - Absent 3 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 514
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-599) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-599).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Edgecomb of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 24, 2016: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor