+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On December 30, 2013 in the House:
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013.
- Reported by Representative FARNSWORTH for the Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor