+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 23 section 4209-A
- Chapter null - 6 section 302
- Chapter 211 - 23 section 4209-A
- Chapter 211 - 6 section 302