+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-439) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-439) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator COLLINS of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-439).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-439) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 254 - 21-A section 301, sub-section 1, paragraph E
- Chapter 254 - 21-A section 303, sub-section 2
- Chapter 254 - 21-A section 303-A
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor