+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-644) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-619) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-644)
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-619) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-644) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-644) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-619) thereto ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-644) was ADOPTED
- Sent down for concurrence
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-644) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-619) thereto.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Reports READ
- Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report .
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . Roll Call Ordered
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Senator POULIOT of Kennebec asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw their motion for a Roll Call.
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-644) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-644) in concurrence
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 309
- (Yeas 76 - Nays 61 - Absent 14 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-644) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-644).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 25, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on April 23, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 15, 2021: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 61
- Absent: 14