+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (96)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed FINAL PASSage - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence.
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 87 - Nays 57 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 513
- This being a Constitutional Amendment, a two-thirds vote of the House being necessary, a total was taken.
- Subsequently, FAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-587) , in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-587) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- Roll Call # 395
- On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot the the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered (Remarks Made)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator CAIN of Penobscot moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report Committee Amendment "B" (H-587), in concurrence. On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-587) Report, in concurrence.
- Reports READ
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-587).
- Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-587) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 92 - Nays 56 - Absent 3 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 468
- On motion of Representative ROTUNDO of Lewiston, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the RESOLUTION and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending FINAL PASSAGE, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, FAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reports READ.
- (24 -Yeas, 11 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 86
- On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- PREVAILED
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-127) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-127), in concurrence..
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-127).
- Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-127) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 90 - Nays 50 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 104
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2014: Final Passage - Con Res
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 7
February 11, 2014: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
January 30, 2014: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 3
May 21, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
May 20, 2013: Acc Maj OTP as Amended Rep
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 50
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor