+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Subsequently, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the it voted to INSIST.
- Subsequently, Representative FREDETTE of Newport, WITHDREW his REQUEST for a roll call.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending the motion of Representative BECK of Waterville to RECONSIDER whereby the House voted to INSIST. Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- Representative FREDETTE of Newport REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
- Representative BECK of Waterville moved that the House RECONSIDER its action whereby it voted to INSIST.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- HELD at the Request of Representative BECK of Waterville.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-401) In NON-CONCURRENCE
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- RELEASED.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently, motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock to ACCEPT The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 613 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-401) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-401)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- HELD at the Request of Senator MASON of Androscoggin.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Senator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 6, 2016: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor