+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-324).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-324) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-324), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 26 section 1037
- Chapter 52 - 26 section 1037
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor