+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-363) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-363), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-363).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (30)
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2, sub-section 15, paragraph G
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2, sub-section 26
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 10, sub-section 2-B, paragraph B
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 453, sub-section 2-C
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 453, sub-section 2-D
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 453-A, sub-section 9
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 453-D, sub-section 1
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 453-D, sub-section 2
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 453-D, sub-section 3
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 601, sub-section 2, paragraph J
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 652, sub-section 6
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 706, sub-section 1
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 712, sub-section 2
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 714, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1001, sub-section 3, paragraph G
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1003, sub-section 3, paragraph G
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1004, sub-section 3, paragraph G
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1005, sub-section 3, paragraph G
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1012, sub-section 4
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1073
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1075-A, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1075-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 1075-A, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2519, sub-section 1
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2519, sub-section 2
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2519, sub-section 4
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2519, sub-section 6-B
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2519, sub-section 7
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2519, sub-section 8
- Chapter 167 - 28-A section 2519, sub-section 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor