+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With the Bill and accompanying papers being INDEFINITELY POSTPONED
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor