+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Speaker laid before the House
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, TABLED pending REFERENCE.
- Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Sponsors (2)
MARTIN
Type:
Primary Sponsor