+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-266) , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-266) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-266).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-266) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 305 - 17 section 314, paragraph 2
- Chapter 305 - 17 section 315-A