+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-512), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-512) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-512).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On December 23, 2015 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2015.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor