+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 118 having voted in the affirmative and 28 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 657V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- LD 1498 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 29 In Favor and 5 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
- Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 654 Yeas 5 - Nays 30 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-620) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-620) in concurrence
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Reports READ
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-620).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-620) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 114 - Nays 32 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 542
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On December 23, 2015 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2015.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 511 - 22 section 3174-X
+ − Votes (4)
April 29, 2016: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 5
April 29, 2016: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
April 12, 2016: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 30
March 31, 2016: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor