+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On December 23, 2015 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2015.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 380 - 27 section 410-A
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor