+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-611), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-611) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED.
- The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 528
- (Yeas 91 - Nays 58 - Absent 2 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-611) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-611).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Report Accepted in concurrence
- Reports READ
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro the Majority REFER to the Committee on JUDICIARY Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On December 23, 2015 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2015.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 29, 2016: ACC OUGHT TO PASS AS AMEND REP
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 2