+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Reports READ
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter null - 35-A section 3143, sub-section 2, paragraph D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor