+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-120).
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-120) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox, Senate Amendment "A" (S-120) ADOPTED.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" S-120.
- On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox, Senate Amendment "A" (S-120) READ.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME.
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 195 - 29-A section 2357, sub-section 2, paragraph E
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor