+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ ONCEUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor