+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- 89 having voted in the affirmative and 53 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and 0 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 362V
- This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- LD 1462 In Senate, June 19, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-159).
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-159) READ and ADOPTED.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-159).
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 21, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 53
- Absent: 9
June 19, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 35