+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-36).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-36) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-36), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On March 10, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 4, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 19, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor