+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (56)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Senator HASKELL of Cumberland moved to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Bill and accompanying papers , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Special Study Table by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-669).
- Speaker laid before the House
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-669) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-669) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- READ ONCE
- Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-669) Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 524 10 Yeas - 24 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED
- Subsequently, ACCEPTANCE of Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-670) , in concurrence. FAILED
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- Senator PATRICK of Oxford moved to Accept the Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-670) Report , in concurrence.
- On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-670) , in concurrence.
- Unfinished Business
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-670).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-670) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 75 - Nays 60 - Absent 16 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 597
- Subsequently, REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended.
- Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended.
- Reports READ.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2014: Accept RPT "B" OPT-A
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2014: Acc Report 'B' OTP as Amend
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 60
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor