+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-282), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-282) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-282).
On June 1, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On May 5, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 320 - 20-A section 6555, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter 320 - 20-A section 1001, sub-section 9-A, paragraph A
- Chapter 320 - 20-A section 1001, sub-section 9, paragraph 1
- Chapter 320 - 20-A section 1001, sub-section 8-A
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor